Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 06/10/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/16/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/16/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/25/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/25/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/25/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/16/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/16/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/17/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/31/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/03/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/03/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/03/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/08/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/11/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/11/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/11/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/16/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 09/17/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/23/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/23/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/23/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/25/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/29/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/29/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/29/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/22/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/22/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/11/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 02/11/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/19/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/22/1998
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/03/1998