Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 06/03/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/03/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/03/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/03/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 06/03/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/03/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/03/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/05/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/12/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/12/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/11/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/28/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/30/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/30/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/30/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/28/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/28/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/28/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/28/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/28/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/12/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/28/1998
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 01/28/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/28/1998
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 01/28/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 01/28/1998
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/28/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/28/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/28/1998
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/24/1998
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/24/1998
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/24/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/24/1998
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/24/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/24/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 02/24/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/24/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/24/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/24/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/24/1998
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/24/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/24/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/24/1998
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/24/1998
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/24/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/24/1998
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/03/1998
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/03/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/03/1998
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/1998
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/05/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/05/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/05/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/05/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 03/05/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/11/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/11/1998
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/11/1998
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/11/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/11/1998
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/11/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/11/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/11/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/18/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/18/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/18/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/18/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/18/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/18/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/25/1998
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/25/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/25/1998
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/01/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/01/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/01/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/22/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/22/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/22/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/22/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/22/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/22/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/22/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/22/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/22/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/23/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/23/1998
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/30/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/30/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/06/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/06/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/06/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/14/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/14/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/14/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/14/1998
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/14/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/19/1998
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/09/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/09/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/09/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 08/07/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/07/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/07/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew