Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 05/08/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/08/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/16/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 05/16/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/16/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/22/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/17/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/17/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/03/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/26/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/26/1998
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/1998
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/04/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/01/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/01/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/21/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/21/1998
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/13/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/13/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/25/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/23/1998