Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/22/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/13/1998
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/13/1998
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/13/1998
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/11/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/31/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/1998
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 08/03/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 08/03/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 08/03/1998
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 08/04/1998
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/04/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/04/1998
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 08/04/1998