Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/01/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/01/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/19/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/19/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/19/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/19/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/27/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/24/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew