Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/17/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/17/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/29/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/29/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/08/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/08/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/08/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/18/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/18/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/18/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 09/18/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/28/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/28/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/29/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/06/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/28/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 01/28/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/28/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 02/11/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/11/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 02/26/1998
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/11/1998
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/18/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/18/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/18/1998
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/25/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/31/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/22/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/06/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/06/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/14/1998
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/14/1998
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/14/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/14/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/14/1998
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/14/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/24/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/24/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/15/1998