Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 03/13/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/13/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/20/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/20/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 03/20/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/20/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/20/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/20/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/20/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/20/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/20/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/20/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/10/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/10/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/08/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/16/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/16/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/16/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/16/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/16/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/16/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/03/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/11/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/11/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/12/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/13/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/13/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/04/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew