Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/10/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/10/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/10/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/13/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/13/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/13/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/20/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/09/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/17/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/17/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/23/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/23/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/23/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 04/23/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/23/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/23/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/23/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/29/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/29/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/16/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 05/16/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/16/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/16/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/16/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/16/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/17/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/17/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/17/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/25/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/10/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/17/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/30/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/30/1997