Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/16/1996
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/16/1996
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 04/16/1996
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/17/1996
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/17/1996
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 04/24/1996
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 04/24/1996
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/24/1996
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/24/1996
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/29/1996
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/29/1996
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/24/1996
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/25/1996
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/17/1996