Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/08/1995
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 09/08/1995
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 09/08/1995
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 09/08/1995
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/26/1995
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/28/1995
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/29/1995
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/29/1995
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 10/19/1995
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/19/1995
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/19/1995
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/19/1995
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/19/1995
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 10/19/1995
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 10/19/1995
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/19/1995
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 10/19/1995
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/19/1995
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 10/19/1995
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 10/19/1995
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/19/1995
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 10/19/1995
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 10/19/1995
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/19/1995
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 10/19/1995
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 10/19/1995
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 10/19/1995
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/19/1995
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/24/1995
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 11/02/1995
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/08/1995
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/09/1995
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 11/13/1995
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/14/1995
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/27/1995
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 11/29/1995
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 11/29/1995
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/30/1995
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 12/06/1995
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 12/07/1995
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 12/08/1995
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 12/11/1995
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/11/1995
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 12/21/1995