Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 03/23/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 04/05/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/05/1995
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/05/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/05/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/05/1995
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/05/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/05/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/05/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/05/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/05/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/05/1995
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/05/1995
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/05/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/05/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/05/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 04/05/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/05/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/05/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/05/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/05/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/05/1995
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/05/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/05/1995
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/05/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/05/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 05/02/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/02/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/02/1995
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/02/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/02/1995
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/02/1995
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/02/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/02/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/02/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/02/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/02/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 05/02/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/02/1995
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/02/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/02/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/02/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/02/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/02/1995
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/02/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/02/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/02/1995
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/02/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/02/1995
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/02/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/02/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/02/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/11/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/11/1995
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/11/1995
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/11/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/11/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/11/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/16/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/16/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/16/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/20/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/20/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/17/1995
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/17/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/17/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/21/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/21/1995
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/21/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/21/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/21/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/21/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/27/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/27/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/27/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/27/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 07/27/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/27/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 08/02/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 08/02/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 08/02/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 08/02/1995
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/04/1995
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/04/1995
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 08/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/04/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/19/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/19/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/19/1995
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/19/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/19/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/19/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/25/1995
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 11/08/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/16/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/04/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 12/07/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 12/07/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/15/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 12/21/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 12/22/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/04/1996
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/01/1996
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/01/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/01/1996
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/27/1996
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/27/1996
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 03/06/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 03/07/1996
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/07/1996
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/14/1996
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/14/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/20/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/20/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/21/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/21/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/27/1996
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 03/27/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/27/1996
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/27/1996
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/27/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/27/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/28/1996
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/29/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/29/1996
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/29/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/29/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 03/29/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/15/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/15/1996
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/16/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/18/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/18/1996
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/23/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/23/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/23/1996
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/23/1996
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/25/1996
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 04/25/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/30/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/30/1996
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/30/1996
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/07/1996
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/07/1996
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/10/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/10/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/10/1996
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/10/1996
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/10/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/14/1996
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 05/14/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/16/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/21/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 05/21/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/23/1996
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/23/1996
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/30/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/30/1996
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/30/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/04/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 06/04/1996
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/19/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/19/1996