Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/15/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/15/1996
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/15/1996
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/15/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/15/1996
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/25/1996
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/25/1996
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/25/1996
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/25/1996
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/25/1996
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/25/1996
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/25/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/25/1996
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/25/1996
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/25/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/25/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/25/1996
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/25/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/25/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/25/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/25/1996
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/25/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/25/1996
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/12/1996
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/12/1996
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 09/12/1996
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/12/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/12/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/12/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/12/1996
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/12/1996
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/1996
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/12/1996
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/12/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/12/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/25/1996
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/1996
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/25/1996
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/27/1996