Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 02/14/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/28/1995
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/08/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/14/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/02/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/12/1995