Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Flanagan, Michael Patrick [R-IL-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Frisa, Dan [R-NY-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/04/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 01/04/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/11/1995
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/13/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 01/13/1995
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 01/13/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/13/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 01/13/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 01/13/1995
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/13/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 01/13/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 02/01/1995
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/01/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/01/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/01/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/01/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/27/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/27/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/27/1995
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/27/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/27/1995