Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/30/1995
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 01/30/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/10/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/10/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 02/10/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/10/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/10/1995
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/10/1995
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/10/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/10/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/28/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 02/28/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 02/28/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/28/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/22/1995
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/22/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/22/1995
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/22/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/06/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/06/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/11/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/11/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 05/11/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/08/1995
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/08/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/08/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/08/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 06/08/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 06/16/1995
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/16/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/16/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/16/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/21/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/21/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/29/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/29/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/29/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/29/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/30/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/30/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/12/1995
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/12/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/12/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/13/1995
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/13/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/13/1995
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/13/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/13/1995
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/17/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/17/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/20/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 07/20/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/20/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/20/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/21/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/25/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/25/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/25/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/28/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/28/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 07/31/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/31/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 08/03/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 08/03/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 08/04/1995
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/06/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/06/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/06/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/06/1995
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/06/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/06/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/12/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/12/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/12/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/12/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/12/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/13/1995
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/13/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/13/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/13/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/13/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 09/14/1995
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/14/1995
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/14/1995
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/14/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2] 09/18/1995
Rep. Waldholtz, Enid Greene [R-UT-2] 09/18/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 09/18/1995

Show cosponsors who withdrew