Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/31/1996
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 07/31/1996
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/31/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/02/1996
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 08/02/1996
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/02/1996
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/02/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 08/02/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 08/02/1996
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/05/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/05/1996
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/05/1996
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 09/05/1996
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/05/1996
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/05/1996
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 09/05/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/05/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/05/1996
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/05/1996
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/05/1996
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/11/1996
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/11/1996
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/11/1996
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 09/11/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/11/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/11/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/11/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/17/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/17/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/17/1996
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 09/27/1996