Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/23/1996
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/23/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/23/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 01/23/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/23/1996
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/23/1996
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/23/1996
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 01/23/1996
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/24/1996
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 01/24/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 01/24/1996
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/24/1996
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/24/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 01/24/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 01/24/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/24/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/25/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/25/1996
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/25/1996
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/25/1996
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/25/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 01/25/1996
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 01/25/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/30/1996
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 01/30/1996
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 01/30/1996
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/30/1996
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/30/1996
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2] 01/30/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/30/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/01/1996
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/01/1996
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/01/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/01/1996
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/29/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/29/1996
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/29/1996
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/29/1996
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/29/1996
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/29/1996
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/29/1996
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/10/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/17/1996
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 07/17/1996