Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 12/14/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 12/15/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 12/15/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 12/19/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/19/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 01/23/1996
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 01/23/1996
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/23/1996
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/23/1996
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 01/23/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 01/23/1996
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 01/23/1996
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/23/1996
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/24/1996
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 01/31/1996
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/31/1996
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 01/31/1996
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/31/1996
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/09/1996
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/09/1996
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 02/09/1996
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/09/1996
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/27/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/27/1996
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/27/1996
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/05/1996
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/05/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/05/1996
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/05/1996
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/05/1996
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/12/1996
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/12/1996
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/12/1996
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/12/1996
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/12/1996
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/12/1996
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/14/1996
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/19/1996
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/19/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/19/1996
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/19/1996
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/19/1996
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/21/1996
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/15/1996
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/15/1996
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/15/1996
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/15/1996
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/30/1996
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/30/1996
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/30/1996
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/14/1996
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 05/14/1996
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/14/1996
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/14/1996
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/20/1996
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/20/1996
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/04/1996
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/04/1996
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/04/1996
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/11/1996
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 06/11/1996
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/11/1996
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/11/1996
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/26/1996
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 06/26/1996
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 06/26/1996
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/26/1996
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/26/1996
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/26/1996