Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 07/12/1995
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/24/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 07/24/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/24/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/28/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/28/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 08/04/1995
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/17/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 10/17/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 10/17/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/17/1995
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/24/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/31/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 10/31/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/21/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 12/21/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/28/1996
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/28/1996
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 04/15/1996
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/23/1996