Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Brownback, Sam [R-KS-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/16/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Chrysler, Dick [R-MI-8]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Cooley, Wes [R-OR-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 06/16/1995
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/16/1995
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/16/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/16/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 06/16/1995
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/16/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 07/11/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/11/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/07/1995
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/12/1995
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/14/1995
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 09/14/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/19/1995
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/19/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/25/1995
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/09/1995
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/29/1995
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 12/05/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 12/18/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 03/27/1996
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 04/25/1996
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 04/25/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew