Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/21/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/21/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/21/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/21/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/21/1995
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/21/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/21/1995
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/21/1995
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/21/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/21/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/21/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/21/1995
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/21/1995
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/21/1995
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/21/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/21/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/21/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/21/1995
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/21/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/21/1995
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/21/1995
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/21/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/21/1995
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/21/1995
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/21/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/21/1995
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/21/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/21/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/21/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/21/1995
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/21/1995
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/21/1995
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/21/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/21/1995
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 06/21/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/21/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/21/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/27/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/27/1995
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/27/1995
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/27/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/13/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/13/1995
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/13/1995
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/13/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/13/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/13/1995
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/13/1995
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/13/1995
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/13/1995
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/13/1995
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/20/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/20/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/20/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/31/1995
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/31/1995
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/31/1995
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/01/1995
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 08/03/1995
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 08/03/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/06/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/06/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/06/1995
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/06/1995
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/06/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/21/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 09/25/1995
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/25/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/27/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/29/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/25/1995
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/25/1995
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/26/1995
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 10/26/1995
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/26/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 10/26/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/31/1995
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/07/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 11/07/1995
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 11/09/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/13/1995
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/13/1995
Rep. Tate, Randy [R-WA-9] 11/15/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/15/1995
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 11/20/1995
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 11/20/1995
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 11/20/1995
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 12/07/1995
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 01/05/1996
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 01/05/1996
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-At Large] 01/23/1996
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 01/23/1996
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 01/23/1996
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/23/1996
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/24/1996
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/28/1996
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/28/1996
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/05/1996
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/18/1996
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/19/1996
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/19/1996
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/19/1996
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/20/1996
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/21/1996
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/22/1996
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/27/1996
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/27/1996
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-9] 03/27/1996
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/28/1996
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 04/15/1996
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/15/1996
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/15/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/15/1996
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/25/1996
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/18/1996
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 09/19/1996
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 09/24/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/26/1996