Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/11/1995
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 05/11/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Funderburk, David [R-NC-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 05/11/1995
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/18/1995
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/18/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 05/18/1995
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 05/18/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/23/1995
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/23/1995
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/13/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/15/1995
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/20/1995