Refine your search

Date Major Actions
07/25/1996 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 104-707 filed.(text of conference report: CR H8387-8458)
10/11/1995 To conference: Senate insisted on its amendment, requested a conference.
10/11/1995 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 143 with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Yea-Nay Vote. 95-2. Record Vote No: 487.
10/11/1995 Senate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/19/1995 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 345 - 79 (Roll no. 671).
06/22/1995 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Economic and Educational. H. Rept. 104-152.
05/11/1995 Introduced in House