Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 04/06/1995
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/06/1995
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/01/1995
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/09/1995
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/09/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/09/1995
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/09/1995
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/09/1995
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/09/1995
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/09/1995
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/09/1995
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/09/1995
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/09/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/10/1995
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/10/1995
Rep. Longley, James B., Jr. [R-ME-1] 05/10/1995
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/11/1995
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Cremeans, Frank A. [R-OH-6] 05/11/1995
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/11/1995
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/11/1995
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 05/11/1995
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/12/1995
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/15/1995
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/15/1995
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/17/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/17/1995
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/18/1995
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/22/1995
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/20/1995
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/20/1995
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/30/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/19/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/25/1995
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/25/1995
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/25/1995
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/25/1995
Rep. Seastrand, Andrea H. [R-CA-22] 07/25/1995
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 07/25/1995
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/25/1995
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/25/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/25/1995
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/25/1995
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/08/1995
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/16/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/16/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 11/20/1995
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/29/1995
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 12/06/1995
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 12/06/1995
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 12/07/1995
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/14/1995
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 01/03/1996