Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/10/1995
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/10/1995
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/10/1995
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/21/1995
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/21/1995
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/21/1995
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/21/1995
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/21/1995
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/21/1995
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/23/1995
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/23/1995
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/23/1995
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/23/1995
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/23/1995
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/03/1995
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 04/03/1995
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/03/1995
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/03/1995
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 04/03/1995
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/02/1995
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/02/1995
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/02/1995
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/02/1995
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/11/1995
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/11/1995
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/11/1995
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/11/1995
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/11/1995
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/11/1995
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/06/1995
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/06/1995
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/06/1995
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/06/1995
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/06/1995
Rep. Martini, William J. [R-NJ-8] 06/06/1995
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/06/1995
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/06/1995
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/17/1995
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/17/1995
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/17/1995
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/17/1995
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/17/1995
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/1995
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 08/04/1995
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/04/1995
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/12/1995
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/20/1995
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/10/1995
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/10/1995
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 10/10/1995
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 10/10/1995
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/17/1995
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/17/1995
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 10/17/1995
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/17/1995
Rep. Heineman, Frederick K. (Fred) [R-NC-4] 10/26/1995
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/26/1995
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/26/1995
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/01/1995
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/01/1995
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/01/1995
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/01/1995
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/14/1995
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/14/1995
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 11/29/1995
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/29/1995
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/29/1995
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/29/1995
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/29/1995
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 11/29/1995
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/29/1995
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 12/04/1995
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 12/04/1995
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 12/04/1995
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 12/18/1995
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 12/18/1995
Rep. Frazer, Victor O. [I-VI-At Large] 01/04/1996
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/04/1996
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/04/1996
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/04/1996
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 01/04/1996
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/04/1996
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/04/1996
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/31/1996
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/31/1996
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/29/1996
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/29/1996
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/20/1996
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 03/20/1996
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/17/1996
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/17/1996
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/17/1996
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/23/1996
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/24/1996
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/06/1996
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/06/1996

Show cosponsors who withdrew