Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 09/21/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 09/21/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/22/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/22/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/26/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/26/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 09/28/1994
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/30/1994

Show cosponsors who withdrew