Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 05/11/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 06/16/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/16/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/16/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/16/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/16/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/16/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 06/16/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/16/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/16/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/16/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/16/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/16/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/13/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/13/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/13/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/13/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/13/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/13/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/13/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/13/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/13/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/13/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/13/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/13/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/13/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/13/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/13/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 07/13/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/13/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/13/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/13/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/13/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/13/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/13/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/13/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/13/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/13/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/13/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 07/13/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 07/13/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/13/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/13/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/13/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 07/13/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 07/13/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 07/13/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/13/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/14/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/14/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/14/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 07/14/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/15/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/15/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/26/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/26/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/26/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/26/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/04/1993