Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/22/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/22/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/22/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/22/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/22/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/22/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/22/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 04/28/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/28/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/28/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/28/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/28/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/29/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 04/29/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/29/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/06/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/20/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/24/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/10/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 10/13/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/18/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/18/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 10/18/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/18/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/18/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/18/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 10/18/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/18/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/18/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/18/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 10/18/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/18/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/25/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 10/26/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/26/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/26/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 10/26/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/26/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/26/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 10/26/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/01/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/01/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 11/01/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 11/01/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/01/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 11/01/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/01/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 11/01/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 11/01/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 11/08/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 11/18/1993