Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/03/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/24/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/24/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/24/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/24/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/24/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/24/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/24/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/24/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/24/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/24/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/24/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/24/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/24/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/24/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/24/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/24/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/24/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/24/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/24/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 02/24/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/24/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/24/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/02/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/02/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/02/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/02/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/02/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/02/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/02/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/02/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/04/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/04/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 03/04/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/04/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/11/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/11/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/16/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/18/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 03/18/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/24/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/26/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/30/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/19/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/19/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/05/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/18/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/18/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 05/18/1993