Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 02/10/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/10/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/28/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/28/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/28/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/28/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 02/28/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/28/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 02/28/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/28/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/28/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/28/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/28/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/28/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/28/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/28/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/28/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/28/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 02/28/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/28/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/28/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/28/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/28/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 02/28/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 02/28/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/28/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/28/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/28/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 02/28/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/28/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 02/28/1994
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 02/28/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 02/28/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/28/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/28/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/28/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/28/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/28/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/28/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/02/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 03/02/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/02/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/03/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/03/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 03/08/1994