Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/10/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/10/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/17/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/17/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/17/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/17/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/17/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/29/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/29/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/29/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 06/29/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/29/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/29/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/29/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/29/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/29/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/29/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/29/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/29/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/30/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/13/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/15/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/15/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/15/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/15/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/15/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/15/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/15/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/15/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 07/15/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/20/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/27/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 07/29/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 08/06/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 08/06/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 08/06/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/06/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/06/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/06/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 08/06/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 08/06/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 08/06/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 08/06/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 08/06/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/07/1993