Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/24/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 02/24/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/09/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/10/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/10/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/16/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/16/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 03/22/1993