Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 07/19/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 07/19/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/21/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/21/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/21/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/21/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/21/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/21/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 07/21/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/22/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/22/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/22/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/22/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/22/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 07/22/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/22/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 07/22/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/26/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/26/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/26/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/28/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/28/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 08/02/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 08/02/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/04/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/04/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 08/04/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/12/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/13/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/13/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/13/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/13/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/13/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/13/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/13/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 09/19/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 09/19/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/19/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/19/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/19/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/19/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 09/19/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/19/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/19/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/19/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/19/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/19/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/19/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/21/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/26/1994