Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/18/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 02/18/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/24/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/24/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/24/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/24/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/24/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 03/24/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/24/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/30/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/30/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/30/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/30/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/30/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/02/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/02/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 04/02/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/14/1993