Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/16/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/24/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/24/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/24/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 03/10/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/10/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/16/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 03/16/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/16/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/16/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/24/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 03/24/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/19/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 04/19/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/19/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/10/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/18/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 06/30/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/30/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/30/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/15/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 07/15/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/15/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 07/15/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/28/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/28/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/28/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/07/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/07/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 10/26/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 10/26/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 10/26/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 10/26/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/04/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/04/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/23/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/23/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/23/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/03/1994