Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/09/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/09/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/09/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 03/09/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/09/1993
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 03/09/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/22/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/22/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/22/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/22/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/22/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/22/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/29/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/16/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/16/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/30/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/30/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/01/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/15/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/15/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/21/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 07/27/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/27/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/30/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/30/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/08/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/08/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/14/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 09/14/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/15/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/28/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/28/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/15/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/15/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/15/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 10/15/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 10/15/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 10/20/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/20/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/01/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/02/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 02/02/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/02/1994
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/02/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/02/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 02/02/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/02/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 02/03/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/03/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/03/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/03/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/03/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 02/03/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/03/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/10/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 02/10/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 02/10/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/23/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 02/23/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/11/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/11/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/11/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/22/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/22/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/13/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/13/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/13/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/13/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 05/03/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/03/1994
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 05/03/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/03/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 05/05/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/16/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/15/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/15/1994