Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/20/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/28/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/28/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/05/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/05/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 05/05/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 05/12/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/10/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/14/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/02/1994