Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/21/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/21/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 04/21/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/21/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/16/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/16/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/16/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/16/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/16/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 07/22/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/22/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 07/22/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 07/22/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/22/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/22/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 07/27/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 08/09/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/27/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 09/27/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 10/06/1994