Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 02/10/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/11/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/11/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/11/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/11/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/11/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/11/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/11/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/11/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/11/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/11/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/11/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 02/11/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 02/11/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/11/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 02/11/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 02/11/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/11/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 02/11/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/11/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/11/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/23/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/23/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 02/23/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/23/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 02/23/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/23/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/23/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 02/23/1994
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/23/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/24/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/24/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/24/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/24/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 02/24/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/24/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 02/24/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 02/24/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/03/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/16/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/16/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/16/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/12/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/17/1994
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/17/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 06/17/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/17/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/17/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 06/17/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/17/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 06/27/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/12/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/28/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 09/20/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/30/1994