Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 08/06/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/14/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/14/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/14/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/14/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 09/14/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/14/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/21/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/28/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/28/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/28/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/05/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/05/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/05/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/05/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/12/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/12/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 10/12/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/18/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/08/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 11/08/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 11/08/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/17/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/22/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/25/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 01/25/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/25/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 01/25/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/25/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/25/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 01/25/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/25/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/25/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/25/1994
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 02/03/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/03/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/03/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 02/10/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/10/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/10/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 02/10/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/10/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/10/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 02/10/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/10/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/28/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/28/1994
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/28/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/28/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/28/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/23/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/23/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/18/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/05/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/05/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/05/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/17/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/21/1994
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 06/21/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/21/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 08/18/1994