Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/11/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/11/1993
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/11/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/11/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/11/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 03/11/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/02/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/02/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/02/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/02/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/02/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/02/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/02/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/02/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/02/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 04/02/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/02/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 04/02/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 04/02/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/02/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/02/1993
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 04/02/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/02/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/02/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/02/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/29/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/29/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/29/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/29/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 04/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/06/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/06/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/06/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/10/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 05/10/1993