Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 05/06/1992
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 05/19/1992
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL] 05/19/1992
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/19/1992
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/19/1992
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/19/1992
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/19/1992
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/19/1992
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/19/1992
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/19/1992
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/19/1992
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/20/1992
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 05/20/1992
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 05/20/1992
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/20/1992
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/21/1992
Sen. Cranston, Alan [D-CA] 05/21/1992
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/02/1992
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/03/1992
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND] 06/03/1992
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 06/03/1992
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/03/1992
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/03/1992
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/03/1992
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/03/1992
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/03/1992
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/03/1992
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/03/1992
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/03/1992
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 06/03/1992
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/03/1992
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/03/1992
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/03/1992
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/03/1992
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/03/1992
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 06/03/1992
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/04/1992
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/04/1992
Sen. Seymour, John [R-CA] 06/04/1992
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/04/1992
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 06/04/1992
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/04/1992
Sen. Bentsen, Lloyd M. [D-TX] 06/04/1992
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/04/1992
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 06/04/1992
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/09/1992
Sen. Kasten, Robert W., Jr. [R-WI] 06/09/1992
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/09/1992
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/09/1992
Sen. Fowler, Wyche, Jr. [D-GA] 06/09/1992
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/09/1992
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/09/1992
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/09/1992
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/09/1992
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/09/1992
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/09/1992
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 06/09/1992
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/09/1992
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 06/10/1992
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/10/1992
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 06/10/1992
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 06/10/1992
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/10/1992
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/10/1992
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC] 06/10/1992
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/11/1992
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 06/11/1992
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/11/1992
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/11/1992
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/23/1992
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/02/1992