Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Heinz, John [R-PA]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Dixon, Alan J. [D-IL]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Sanford, Terry [D-NC]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Adams, Brock [D-WA]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Burdick, Quentin N. [D-ND]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Wilson, Pete [R-CA]* 03/15/1989
Sen. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO] 03/16/1989
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/10/1989
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/10/1989
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/10/1989
Sen. Matsunaga, Spark M. [D-HI] 04/10/1989
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/10/1989
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 04/12/1989
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/19/1989
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/16/1989
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/16/1989
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/15/1989
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/06/1989
Sen. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN] 02/22/1990

Show cosponsors who withdrew