Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 09/18/1990
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 09/18/1990
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 09/18/1990
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 09/18/1990
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/18/1990
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 09/18/1990
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 09/18/1990
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/27/1990
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 09/27/1990
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/27/1990
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/27/1990
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 09/27/1990
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/27/1990
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/27/1990
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 09/27/1990
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 09/27/1990
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 09/27/1990
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 09/27/1990
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/27/1990
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/27/1990
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/27/1990
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 09/27/1990
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 09/27/1990
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 09/27/1990
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 09/27/1990
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/27/1990
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/04/1990
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/04/1990
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/04/1990
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 10/04/1990
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 10/04/1990
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/04/1990
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 10/04/1990
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/04/1990
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/04/1990
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/10/1990
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/10/1990
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/10/1990
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 10/10/1990
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 10/10/1990
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 10/10/1990
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/10/1990
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 10/10/1990
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 10/10/1990
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/10/1990
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 10/13/1990
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/13/1990
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/13/1990
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 10/13/1990
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/26/1990
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 10/26/1990
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 10/26/1990
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 10/26/1990